Bruni, Joseph (CPSO#: 22811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Queen Street East
Suite 927
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5501
Fax: (416) 864-5631
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Columbus Medical Arts Building
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: 416 8645501
Fax: (416) 864-5631
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 28 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BRUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970