Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bruni, Teresa (CPSO#: 62624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Paediatrics
1260 Golf Links Rd
Suite #104
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 766-3370
Fax: (807) 766-3374
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teresa Bruni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bruni ( CPSO# 62624 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Paediatrics
588 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5R7
Phone Number: (807) 766-3370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA BRUNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRUNI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1991