Bruyere, Jean-Charles (CPSO#: 18489)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Feb 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007