Bryan, Sean Alan (CPSO#: 104160)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017