Brydon, Lizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 60562)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 1995 to 14 Sep 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 1996