Bryer, Daniel George (CPSO#: 21881)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 2010