Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Brymer, Christopher David (CPSO#: 63468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room B109
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3922
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Brymer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Brymer ( CPSO# 63468 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
Suite B9-104
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 633-3922

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Business Address:
801 Commissioners Road East
Suite A-200
London ON  N5C 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 685-4021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DAVID BRYMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1991