Bryson, John Robert (CPSO#: 53972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
16-102
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000 Ext. 5022
Fax: (416) 946-2866
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.R. Bryson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bryson ( CPSO# 53972 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Room 16-102
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT BRYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2002