Bryson, Samuel Charles Peter (CPSO#: 50220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital - V4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4423
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Peter Bryson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bryson ( CPSO# 50220 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL CHARLES PETER BRYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1986