Brzezinska-Pytlak, Hanna Gabriela (CPSO#: 55276)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
278 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V4
Phone: (613) 233-1565
Fax: (613) 233-1851
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hanna Brzezinska-Pytlak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Brzezinska-Pytlak ( CPSO# 55276 )

Business Address:
278 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V4
Phone Number: (613) 233-1565

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANNA GABRIELA BRZEZINSKA-PYTLAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRZEZINSKA-PYTLAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991