Brzezinski, Alex Elias Samuel (CPSO#: 45811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pav E Room 938
3755 Cote Ste Catherine Road
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-7558
Fax: (514) 340-7559

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEX ELIAS SAMUEL BRZEZINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRZEZINSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1993