Brzezinski Sourasky, Aaron (CPSO#: 55913)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National Autonomous University of Mexico, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2005