Brzozowski, Michael Stanley (CPSO#: 59864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Services
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Brzozowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brzozowski ( CPSO# 59864 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Services
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STANLEY BRZOZOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRZOZOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1992