Bu Jassoum, Salha Mohammed (CPSO#: 70696)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1999 to 14 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2000 to 14 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2001 to 14 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002