Bu Sbaih, Ahmad Salman A (CPSO#: 104393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9059211340
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD SALMAN A BU SBAIH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BU SBAIH is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BU SBAIH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BU SBAIH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BU SBAIH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BU SBAIH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BU SBAIH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jul 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018