Buck, Erica Aletta Margarethe (CPSO#: 64057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 4500
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Emergency Department
West Nipissing Hospital
111 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P0H 2G0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Emergency Department
Mattawa General Hospital
215- 3rd Street
PO Box 70
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay General Hospital,Civic Site North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERICA ALETTA MARGARETHE BUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000