Buckle, David (CPSO#: 62206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beth Israel Deaconess
Family Medicine Dedham Westwood
Suite 220
333 Elm Street
Dedham MA  02026
United States
Phone: (781) 329-7311
Fax: (781) 461-9224

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BUCKLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1991