Buckler, Philip Michael (CPSO#: 79394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Center
Diagnostic Imaging Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

X-Ray Associates
679 Davis Drive, Suite 104
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-1313
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

X-Ray Associates
125 Pedersen Dr., Units 3, 4, 5
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 751-1500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

X-Ray Associates
250 Harding Blvd. W., Suite B02
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 737-0595
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

X-Ray Associates
955 Major Mackenzie Dr., Suite 102
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: (289) 553-6336
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. R. Hany ( CPSO# 54238 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )
Dr. N. Just ( CPSO# 70679 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 51506 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336


Corporation Name: Buckler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Center
Diagnostic Imaging Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
X-Ray Associates
679 Davis Drive, Suite 104
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
X-Ray Associates
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite B02
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
X-Ray Associates
125 Pedersen Drive
Unit 3, 4, 5
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Business Address:
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6836

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP MICHAEL BUCKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008