Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Buckley, Joyce Beryl Rejeanne Wong (CPSO#: 29797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206B Prescott Street
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 704-1513
Fax: (613) 704-1516
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOYCE BERYL REJEANNE WONG BUCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Aug 2012
Summary:

On August 30, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Joyce Beryl Rejeanne Wong 
Buckley committed an act of professional misconduct, in that the governing body of a health 
profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that the member committed an act of 
professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of misconduct as 
defined in the regulations. 
 
Dr. Buckley practised in New York State pursuant to a license which authorized her to practise 
obstetrics and gynaecology only in the medically under-serviced area of Watertown. On 
September 12, 2008, the New York State Board for Professional Medical Conduct found that, 
between approximately 2005 through 2007, Dr. Buckley reviewed information submitted online 
and authorized the dispensing of prescriptions for non-controlled prescription drugs to persons 
located throughout the United States. Approximately 75,000 prescribing determinations were 
made in her name, at $2.00 per determination. The online patient information was grossly 
insufficient to make an informed decision about whether the drug should ultimately be dispensed. 
It was found that Dr. Buckley's conduct was well below acceptable standards of care and 
constituted negligence on more than one occasion, gross negligence, practising the profession 
beyond its authorized scope, failure to maintain patient records and failure to make requested 
records available to the Department. Based on its findings, the New York State Board revoked 
Dr. Buckley's medical license and ordered her to pay a fine of $40,000. 
 
The Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario ordered and 
directed that: 
 
      Dr. Buckley attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
      The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on the certificate of 
      registration of Dr. Buckley: 
      (i) Dr. Buckley must successfully complete, at her own expense, College-facilitated  
      instruction in Ethics. 
      Dr. Buckley pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the 
      date of this order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 30, 2012