Buckstein, Rena Julie (CPSO#: 61247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Boston University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5847
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 15 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENA JULIE BUCKSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 08 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990