Buckton, William Alfred (CPSO#: 22137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
704 Mara Street
Suite 109
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 332-2715
Fax: (519) 332-5200
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Buckton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Buckton ( CPSO# 22137 )

Business Address:
109 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 332-2715

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALFRED BUCKTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969