Buconjic, Tomislav (CPSO#: 70318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 516
509 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6J 1Y5
Phone: 647-345-7302
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Buconjic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2010

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TOMISLAV BUCONJIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCONJIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2001