Buczko, George Bohdan (CPSO#: 30687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996