Budeci, Cristian Lucian (CPSO#: 87453)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 17 Jul 2007 to 05 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 06 Nov 2007 to 16 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jul 2008 to 16 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 28 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2011