Budhwa, Kanta (CPSO#: 26712)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Bombay, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012