Budning, Andrew Stewart (CPSO#: 60349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-5464
Fax: (905) 569-2377
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew S. Budning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Budning ( CPSO# 60349 )

Business Address:
305 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-5464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW STEWART BUDNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUDNING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 05 Jan 1993
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988