Bueno De Mesquita, Mirjam Helena (CPSO#: 110909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 27 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Rome, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology,
Hepatology and Nutrition
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6176
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRJAM HELENA BUENO DE MESQUITA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BUENO DE MESQUITA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BUENO DE MESQUITA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUENO DE MESQUITA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BUENO DE MESQUITA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BUENO DE MESQUITA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BUENO DE MESQUITA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2016 to 26 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018