Buetow, Candice Lee (CPSO#: 68951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Carlton St.
Unit 7
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Phone: (905) 988-1548
Fax: (905) 988-3769
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.L. Buetow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Buetow ( CPSO# 68951 )

Business Address:
7 - 145 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Phone Number: (905) 988-1548

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CANDICE LEE BUETOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUETOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1997