Bugada, Nadia (CPSO#: 56727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle, suite 104
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA BUGADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUGADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988