Bugaresti, Joanne Marie (CPSO#: 33292)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Crown Record Management 1375 Artisan's Court Burlington, Ontario L7L 5Y2
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 02 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010