Bugdahn, Margaret Barbara (CPSO#: 32714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: Bugdahn, Malgorzata (used until: 16 Nov 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 202
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret Bugdahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bugdahn ( CPSO# 32714 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 472-2200

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Medical Solutiions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Email: medicalrecords@docudavit.com Telephone: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 11 Mar 2014

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET BARBARA BUGDAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUGDAHN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1981