Bugis, Samuel Philip (CPSO#: 43877)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Sep 1991