Bui, Esther (CPSO#: 77908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 5th Floor 445
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5320
Fax: (416) 603-5768
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esther Bui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Bui ( CPSO# 77908 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 5th Floor
Room 445
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTHER BUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 24 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007