Bui, Nhiep Xuan (CPSO#: 50225)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 23 Aug 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2015