Bui, Thuc Thuan (CPSO#: 83037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
3033 Palstan Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4E7
Phone: (905) 270-4567
Fax: (905) 270-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hang Bich Trinh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bui ( CPSO# 83037 )
Dr. H. Trinh ( CPSO# 77227 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
3033 Palstan Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4E7
Phone Number: (905) 270-4567


Corporation Name: Thuc Thuan Bui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bui ( CPSO# 83037 )
Dr. H. Trinh ( CPSO# 77227 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
3033 Palstan Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4E7
Phone Number: (905) 270-4567

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THUC THUAN BUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007