Buist, Nigel Anderson (CPSO#: 29469)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993