Bukczynski, Jacob M (CPSO#: 90770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 923-5767
Fax: (416) 923-5125
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Golden Mile Medical Clinic
1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 2L1
Canada
Phone: (416) 285-7575
Fax: (416) 285-7574
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Bukczynski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bukczynski ( CPSO# 90770 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 923-5767

Business Address:
152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Phone Number: (416) 285-7575

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB M BUKCZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKCZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011