Bukhanov, Karina (CPSO#: 59761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
Room 1275
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4805
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K Bukhanov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bukhanov ( CPSO# 59761 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARINA BUKHANOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKHANOV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989