Bukhari, Ayman Abdullah G (CPSO#: 109857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Maternal-Fetal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYMAN ABDULLAH G BUKHARI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BUKHARI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. BUKHARI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUKHARI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BUKHARI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BUKHARI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BUKHARI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018