Bukhari, Majidah Abdulfattah Saber (CPSO#: 88253)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016