Bukhari, Rafat Abdullah Ghaeb (CPSO#: 92125)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 24 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011