Bukovy, Brent Edward (CPSO#: 62456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Spence Clinic
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H7
Phone: (807) 626-1138
Fax: (807) 626-1142
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brent Bukovy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bukovy ( CPSO# 62456 )

Business Address:
The Spence Clinic
500 - 1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H7
Phone Number: (807) 626-1138


Corporation Name: Bukovy Capricci Franchi Hartford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hartford ( CPSO# 52612 )
Dr. D. Franchi ( CPSO# 57144 )
Dr. B. Bukovy ( CPSO# 62456 )
Dr. A. Capricci ( CPSO# 31777 )

Business Address:
The Spence Clinic
500 - 1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5H7
Phone Number: (807) 626-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT EDWARD BUKOVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUKOVY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1992