Bulakhtina, Elena Alexandrovna (CPSO#: 88309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:I.M. Sechenov Moscow Medical Academy, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Regional Forensic Pathology Unit
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46530
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 03 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jun 2014

Pending Hearings

Summary: On September 11, 2017, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee referred the matter of Dr. Bulakhtina’s capacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee.

Hearing Date(s): November 5-9, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jun 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Elena  Alexandrovna  Bulakhtina  may  practise  medicine  independently in
            Forensic Pathology, only. 

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Update: As of February 22, 2018, Dr. Bulakhtina has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)