Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bulat, Robert Stephen (CPSO#: 62260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1430 Tulane Avenue
New Orleans LA  70112
United States
Phone: (504) 988-5763
Fax: (504) 988-2188

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Louisiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 05 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT STEPHEN BULAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1991