Bulatovic-Stajkovic, Sladjana (CPSO#: 90414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 21 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nis, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Serbia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SLADJANA BULATOVIC-STAJKOVIC may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BULATOVIC-STAJKOVIC is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BULATOVIC-STAJKOVIC shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BULATOVIC-STAJKOVIC is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BULATOVIC-STAJKOVIC shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. BULATOVIC-STAJKOVIC ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. BULATOVIC-STAJKOVIC ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Nov 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2014 to 20 Jan 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 21 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2017