Bull, Maurice Henry (CPSO#: 18578)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Feb 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1963
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Feb 2001
Summary:

 On February 13, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bull guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he engaged in acts of sexual impropriety; in that he sexually abused a patient; and, that he 
 engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.

The Committee ordered that Dr. Bull be reprimanded and 
 the reprimand be recorded on the register. As well, the Committee ordered his certificate of 
 registration be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 13, 2001