Bullen Kesty, Cynthia Louise (CPSO#: 43207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: Bullen, Cynthia Louise (used until: 18 Apr 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 472-4782
Fax: (705) 472-1848
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Bullen Kesty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Bullen Kesty ( CPSO# 43207 )

Business Address:
66 Josephine Street
Suite 1
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 476-6959

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA LOUISE BULLEN KESTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLEN KESTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985