Buller, Christopher Edmund Howard (CPSO#: 54208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Room CC7 152
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3070
Fax: (416) 864-5478
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher E. Buller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Buller ( CPSO# 54208 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
Room CC 7-152
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3070

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER EDMUND HOWARD BULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2009