Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bullock, Andrew Micheal (CPSO#: 68688)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Western Australia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 1995 to 31 Mar 1995
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1995