Bullock, Lana (CPSO#: 80847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 940
790 Bay St
PO Box 36
Toronto, ON M5G 1N8
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: 416-926-0101
Fax: 416-926-1910
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lana Bullock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bullock ( CPSO# 80847 )

Business Address:
Womankind Addiction Services
431 Whitney Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8S 2H6
Phone Number: (905) 545-9100

Business Address:
Notre Dame House
14 Cannon Street West
Hamilton ON  L8R 2B3
Phone Number: (905) 308-8090

Business Address:
Suite 940
790 Bay Street
PO Box 36
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 926-0101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANA BULLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BULLOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007